B.W.S.C.A. LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport/recreation for general public, providing buildings/facilities & open space.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,560 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 March 1994: Standard registration
- BRIAN WHITEHEAD SPORTS CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Peter Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Henry Sutcliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harold Glynn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Bromilow | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.33k | £92.04k | £84.08k | £61.33k | £89.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.74k | £58.35k | £89.39k | £58.96k | £51.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £56.90k | £17.00k | £41.00k | £39.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JANUARY 1994 as amended on 02 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN THE MUNICIPAL PARISH OF DOWNTON WITH CHARLTON ALL SAINTS AND STANDLYNCH IN WILTSHIRE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH AND SURROUNDING PARISHES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING ALL FORMS OF SPORTS AND GAMES MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MUNICIPAL PARISH OF DOWNTON WITH CHARLTON ALL SA
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 The Borough
Downton
SALISBURY
SP5 3LY
- Phone:
- 07785265019
- Email:
- simon@bromilows.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window