CHAPELTOWN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1034537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chapeltown Playgroup - Birth to 4yrs Open Friday 10.00am - 11.30am At The Thomas Chambers Newton Memorial Hall, Cowley Lane, Chapeltown, Sheffield S35 1SX, parking, disabled access to a single storey building.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £1,480
Total expenditure: £1,408

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON YOUNG Trustee
None on record
HANNAH HATTERSLEY Trustee
None on record
JANET OGLE Trustee
None on record
GAYNOR PARKIN Trustee
None on record
TINA BAILEY Trustee
None on record
JULIE YOUNG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.16k £771 £1.33k £1.18k £1.48k
Total expenditure £928 £884 £1.07k £1.26k £1.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 STEVEN CRESCENT
CHAPELTOWN
SHEFFIELD
S35 1XN
Phone:
01142402589
Website:

No information available