Accounts and annual returns WILKES GREEN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1034594
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On Time