FRIENDS OF MONNOW VALE HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE FACILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising in support of the said facility
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 11 March 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF MONNOW VALE (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MONMOUTH GENERAL HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan May Crowland | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jarvis | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOAN STOCKER | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILAH MARGARET ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.36k | £2.62k | £3.99k | £2.00k | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.76k | £2.99k | £2.22k | £12.10k | £7.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 2007 & 16 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF MONNOW VALE HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE FACILITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID FACILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE THE MONMOUTH AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 WALLIS CLOSE
OSBASTON
MONMOUTH
NP25 3NS
- Phone:
- 01600713505
- Email:
- smr4wc@lineone.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window