ST ANNE'S PRE-SCHOOL (ROYTON)

Charity Number: 1034612
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005

Total income: £47,205
Total expenditure: £45,038

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 26 April 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 26 April 2007: Funds transferred to 1113566 ST ANNE'S PRESCHOOL ROYTON OLDHAM
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • ST ANNE'S PLAYGROUP (ROYTON) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005
Total gross income £44.52k £47.21k
Total expenditure £52.15k £45.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 19 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 28 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 28 July 2004 On Time