DAY-MER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS AND ITS PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES ARE TO ASSIST IN IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF TURKISH AND KURDIS PEOPLE IN ENGLAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,259 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 31 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMET SEZGIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Selvi Ozdemir | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eren Tan | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cagdas Canbolat | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceren Kardelen Sagir | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.16k | £167.57k | £331.92k | £267.01k | £280.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.41k | £137.71k | £283.63k | £298.34k | £286.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.75k | £84.25k | £185.33k | £53.04k | £45.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD JULY 1991, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 29TH JANUARY 1994 AND 9 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE RESIDING IN ENGLAND FROM TURKEY AND KURDISTAN TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON SUCH MATTERS AS IMMIGRATION SOCIAL SECURITY HOUSING ETC AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAY-MER COMMUNITY CENTRE
16 HOWARD ROAD
LONDON
N16 8PU
- Phone:
- 02072758440
- Email:
- INFO@DAYMER.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window