Accounts and annual returns DRAYCOTT AND WILNE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1034641
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 26 October 2008 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 20 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2006 19 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 26 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 08 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required