WAKEFIELD ONCOLOGY LEUKAEMIA FUND (W.O.L.F.)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for the relief of persons suffering from cancer,leukaemia and other blood disordersin the Wakefield area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
Governance
- 08 March 1994: Standard registration
- THE PINDERFIELDS LEUKAEMIA AND HAEMATOLOGY FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN ASHCROFT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirstie Connelly | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Thomassen | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE JEFFERY | Trustee | 22 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MCGUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Paul Moreton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REBECCA FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £51.61k | £90.35k | £126.22k | £720 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87k | £20.54k | £10.31k | £6.25k | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 334 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 15 JANUARY 2001 AND 16 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, LEUKAEMIA OR OTHER BLOOD DISORDERS AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION FROM TIME TO TIME OF EQUIPMENT FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HAEMATOLOGY AT PINDERFIELDS HOSPITAL WAKEFIELD OR SUCH OTHER HOSPITAL OR MEDICAL CENTRES WHERE HAEMATOLOGY WORK IS CARRIED OUT OR RESEARCHED AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME AGREE UPON (2) THE RELIEF OF CURRENT OR FORMER PATIENTS WHO ARE OR HAVE ATTENDED THE HOSPITALS OR MEDICAL CENTRES MENTIONED IN THE PRECEDING SUB-CLAUSE BY THE PAYMENT OF MONEY OR THE PROVISION OF NECESSITIES AS A CONSEQUENCE OF THEIR TREATMENT
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department of Haematology
Pathology Building
Pinderfields Hospital
Aberford Road
West Yorkshire
WF1 4DG
- Phone:
- 0192543366
- Email:
- morts_v@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window