ST WINEFRIDES PLAYGROUP (HOLYWELL)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of childcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 August 2018
Total income includes £45,500 from 3 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 14 March 1994: Standard registration
- 28 July 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1179493 ST WINEFRIDE'S PRESCHOOL (HOLYWELL)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 05/09/2015 | 05/09/2016 | 05/09/2017 | 28/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.41k | £74.91k | £72.52k | £63.30k | £61.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.97k | £74.91k | £70.82k | £66.06k | £61.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £48.78k | £44.80k | £45.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 August 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 September 2017 | 27 July 2018 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2017 | 27 July 2018 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 05 September 2016 | 22 August 2017 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2016 | 27 November 2017 | 145 days late | |
Annual return | 05 September 2015 | 06 December 2016 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2015 | 06 December 2016 | 154 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window