READING AND DISTRICT GARDENERS MUTUAL IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talks on topics relevant to gardening during winter months. Garden visits and plant sales during summer months
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 08 March 1994: Standard registration
- READING GARDENERS (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Ann Caesar | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Brian Siddall | Trustee | 08 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Dodson | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Leonard Jury | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.89k | £2.98k | £3.07k | £3.41k | £3.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £3.10k | £3.44k | £2.94k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 25/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE IN THE READING AND DISTRICT AREA.
Area of benefit
READING AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Russet Glade
Emmer Green
READING
RG4 8UJ
- Phone:
- 07818423789
- Email:
- readinggardeners@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window