Accounts and annual returns COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE NORTHAMPTON AND COUNTY

Charity number: 1034697
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window