SCANTABOUT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION THAT RAISES FUNDS FOR THE SCHOOL THROUGH VARIOUS ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE YEAR INCLUDING A CHRISTMAS AND SUMMER FAYRE, SCHOOL DISCOS, EASTER EGG HUNT AND QUIZ NIGHT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Candice Stead | Chair | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ashmore | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gibson | Trustee | 06 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.39k | £6.78k | £9.67k | £17.77k | £12.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.67k | £7.42k | £5.17k | £12.99k | £13.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Scantabout Primary School
Ionic Close
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO53 2NR
- Phone:
- 02380266892
- Email:
- ssa.team@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window