Accounts and annual returns FOXHOLE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 February 2025 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 February 2023 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required