FRIENDS OF FARRINGTON GURNEY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1034713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for school - events for village eg fireworks display, barn dance etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £7,603
Total expenditure: £4,153

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOFGS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amie Jayne Johnstone Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Rochelle Louise Carter Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Victoria Jane Clements Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.11k £6.56k £3.58k £5.62k £7.60k
Total expenditure £1.75k £2.48k £5.02k £2.78k £4.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hayboro Farm
Bristol Road
Farrington Gurney
BRISTOL
BS39 6TG
Phone:
01761453364
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available