LUNE VALLEY TRANSPORT ENTERPRISE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for charitable purposes only, transport for the benefit of the people of the Lancashire Lune Valley and South Cumbria areas who are in specific need by reason of their age, youth, poverty, illness or disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 March 1994: Standard registration
- DIAL A BUS/COUNTY CARS LANCASTER/,GARSTANG AND WYRE (Working name)
- DIAL A RIDE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH BUDDEN | Chair |
|
||||||||
Michael Tobias | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GORDON SAMUEL JOSEPH WESTERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WENDY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Diane Crompton | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.08k | £105 | £3.17k | £4.11k | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.88k | £12.27k | £3.64k | £4.45k | £4.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £57.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 DECEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 16 DECEMBER 1992 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY TRANSPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE LANCASHIRE AND LUNE VALLEY AREAS WHO ARE IN SPECIFIC NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE YOUTH POVERTY ILLNESS OR DISABILITY
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE AND THE LUNE VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lune Valley Transport
Unit 5
Vickers Industrial Estate
Mellishaw Lane
MORECAMBE
LA3 3EN
- Phone:
- 07970339025
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window