Financial history MOW COP AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1034771
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008
Total gross income £1.22k £1.28k £1.38k £1.11k £1.23k
Total expenditure £1.14k £1.20k £1.27k £1.41k £920
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A