MOW COP AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1034771
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008

Total income: £1,230
Total expenditure: £920

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 05 May 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008
Total gross income £1.22k £1.28k £1.38k £1.11k £1.23k
Total expenditure £1.14k £1.20k £1.27k £1.41k £920
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 24 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 28 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 19 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 28 February 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required