Accounts and annual returns JACK AND JILL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1034780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 August 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 August 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 July 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 August 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window