PARKLANDS COMMUNITY DAY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of the elderly - in particular the provision of a day centre on one day per week
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 March 1994: Standard registration
- 06 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PARKLANDS COMMUNITY DAY CARE CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £8.80k | £8.91k | £9.01k | £8.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.19k | £8.85k | £8.76k | £8.72k | £7.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 24 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 14 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 03 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR THE RESIDENTS OF CHIPPENHAM,NORTH OF THE BRISTOL AND MARSHFIELD ROAD AND THOSE ROADS LEADING OFF COCKLEBURY ROAD,WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE AND/OR INFIRMITY
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHIPPENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window