THE PLAY HOUSE (B'HAM) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Play House provides exciting particpatory theatre and drama to stimulate the learning of children and young people, igniting the imagination to make sense of the world. Its projects bring the curriculum to life for primary schools, explore social, emotional & health issues and extend these ideas beyond the classroom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 March 1994: Standard registration
- CATALYST (Working name)
- LANGUAGE ALIVE! (Working name)
- PLAY HOUSE PROJECT (Working name)
- EDUCATIONAL THEATRE SERVICES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam Alexandru | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edwards | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adaya Monique Henry | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TESSA TAYLOR | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
KESHENA ELISE BOWIE | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keshena Elise Bowie | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.69k | £146.21k | £128.17k | £196.75k | £233.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.57k | £149.20k | £77.00k | £229.32k | £124.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.83k | £28.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.50k | £27.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 FEBRUARY 1994 as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND COMMUNITY GROUPS IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF DRAMA AND THEATRE (2) TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE FIELD OF ARTS EDUCATION AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES THROUGH TRAINING PROGRAMMES, COURSES, LECTURES, EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, CLASSES AND CONFERENCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE GREAT BRITAIN, NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Action for Children
2-4 Guild Close
Birmingham
B16 8EL
- Phone:
- 01212654425
- Email:
- info@theplayhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window