BISHOPS HULL COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL, PROVIDING PRE-SCHOOL CHILDCARE FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 - 4.THIS SETTING IS BASED IN THE COMMUNITY ROOM OF THE SCHOOL AND OFFERS ACTIVITIES BASED AROUND THE EYFS STATUTORY GUIDANCE, INCLUDING PERSONAL AND SOCIAL SKILLS, PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT, LANGUAGE, BOOKS, PUZZLES,CONSTRUCTION AND NUMEROUS ACTIVITIES BASED AROUND AREAS OF LEARNING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 15 March 1994: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 December 2011: Re-registered
- BISHPS HULL COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Jollands | Chair | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lewis | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sam Jollands | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.79k | £26.50k | £45.11k | £82.90k | £57.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.75k | £33.86k | £37.38k | £76.11k | £48.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.28k | £23.11k | N/A | £70.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 248 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 December 2021 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BISHOPS HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Smithy
Bishops Hull
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 5DT
- Phone:
- 07706732075
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window