Financial history NEW BROUGHTON AND CAEGO WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1034817
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £3.94k £953 £733 £2.45k £891
Total expenditure £3.37k £694 £788 £1.26k £1.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A