Financial history BLACKFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1034829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £507 £474 £11 £193 £590
Total expenditure £461 £107 £310 £557 £546
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A