MILL HILL SYNAGOGUE AND AMENITIES FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 10 March 1994: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2004 | 27 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 22 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO GET A FULLER UNDERSTANDING OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window