Accounts and annual returns RAYLEIGH METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034872
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 October 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 October 2020 133 days late
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 April 2019 On Time