Financial history RAYLEIGH METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034872
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £104.23k £129.62k £109.96k £99.46k £41.84k
Total expenditure £101.41k £121.97k £121.18k £94.58k £56.24k
Income from government contracts £83.29k £95.89k £79.55k £94.14k £11.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.50k N/A