Financial history ROPLEY PLAYGROUP AND PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1034882
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £47.98k £48.65k £45.73k £36.31k £45.16k
Total expenditure £41.24k £45.38k £45.69k £44.00k £53.92k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.07k £31.23k £25.27k £34.79k