TREADAM BARN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote improve and advance education by the encouragement of the arts including the arts of drama, dance, singing and music with an increasing number of events focusing on children. To provide a centre for the use of the inhabitants of Treadam, Llantilio.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward James Swift | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR CHRISTINA FARNCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MOLVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/02/2020 | 20/02/2021 | 20/02/2022 | 20/02/2023 | 20/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.57k | £15.17k | £15.95k | £28.15k | £15.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.66k | £10.17k | £284 | £40.43k | £6.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 February 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 February 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 February 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 February 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA DANCE SINGING AND MUSIC. (B) TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TREADAM LLANTILIO.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TREADAM LLANTILIO
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREADAM FARM
ABERGAVENNY
NP7 8TA
- Phone:
- 07779225921
- Email:
- info@treadam-barn.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window