Financial history ORIEL DAVIES GALLERY

Charity number: 1034890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £394.10k £407.29k £407.37k £483.92k £584.75k
Total expenditure £309.43k £296.68k £344.25k £376.62k £425.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.76k £70.21k £13.94k £34.95k £20.79k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.77k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £68.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £296.84k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.06k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £211.08k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £425.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0