Governing document ORIEL DAVIES GALLERY
Charity number: 1034890

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 1993 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME OF 6 JULY 1998 AND 11TH SEPTEMBER 2002, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 18 JUNE 2008. as amended on 27 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR WALES, IN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS UPON THE VISUAL ARTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.