Accounts and annual returns THE NORTHGATE END CHAPEL CONGREGATION

Charity Number: 1034924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 December 2024 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 December 2024 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 December 2024 771 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 December 2024 1136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days