CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL AND OTHER PURPOSES, GORSLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual distribution of income for charitable purposes and religious activities, at the discretion of the Trustees, after consideration of letters of application from local organisations or individuals within the ecclesiastical parish of Gorsley (including Kilcot).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 17 March 1994: Standard registration
- CHRISTCHURCH GORSLEY CHURCH HALL TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Kirk Rodham | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Fowler | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Gerald Dalby Mr | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Johnson | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Kenneth Powell | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR ALAN JOHN OASTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £1.74k | £1.40k | £2.66k | £3.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.33k | £0 | £500 | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF TRUST DEED DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1954
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PARISH OF GORSLEY
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GORSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAXSTOKE X I X
ASTON INGHAM
ROSS-ON-WYE
HR9 7LS
- Phone:
- 01989720465
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window