Financial history ATLANTIC CHALLENGE GB MARITIME TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1034969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.42k £9.16k £1.44k £1.41k £1.82k
Total expenditure £9.44k £2.33k £4.88k £4.88k £3.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A