W J GREENWOOD DECEASED WILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the interior upkeep of Chedworth Church, Chedworth, Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER GRAHAM STAINFORTH | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
MRS CATE THACKER | Trustee | 21 December 2009 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN TURQUAND COLBECK | Trustee | 18 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HELEN HAMILTON | Trustee | 17 October 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.11k | £5.16k | £5.28k | £5.65k | £5.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.94k | £3.27k | £4.47k | £12.77k | £4.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 20 JUNE 1959 AS PROVED 22 JUNE 1961
Charitable objects
TO USE THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR THE UP KEEP OF THE INTERIOR OF CHEDWORTH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHEDWORTH CHURCH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHCOMBE EDGE
MIDDLE CHEDWORTH
CHEDWORTH
CHELTENHAM
GL54 4AJ
- Phone:
- 01285720146
- Email:
- simoncolbeck@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window