ADVENTURES OFFSHORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our goal is to provide, through the medium of sail training, opportunities for young people and vulnerable adults to discover their sense of adventure, in the process developing transferable skills that will aid their educational, personal, and social development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
57 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 March 1994: Standard registration
- SCOUTS OFFSHORE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Groves | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN SLIM | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edwards | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula-Anne Deighton | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gowers | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Mark Rendle | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.56k | £82.64k | £154.83k | £65.91k | £87.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.84k | £129.19k | £101.74k | £86.13k | £108.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.00k | £41.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 328 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2023 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 April 2023 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 June 2023 | 650 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 May 2022 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912 AND SUBSEQUENT AMENDMENTS.
Charitable objects
TO TEACH YOUNG PEOPLE OFFSHORE SAILING AS A MEDIUM, TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS, AND ABILITY TO WORK IN A TEAM SITUATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adventures Offshore
Tolken
The Lane
West Mersea
COLCHESTER
CO5 8NT
- Phone:
- 01206385071
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window