TOTLEY ALL SAINTS CHURCH PARENT AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity number: 1035020
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

play group for birth to 4 yearolds

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018

Total income: £1,507
Total expenditure: £1,474

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 22 June 2020: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £1.18k £836 £1.08k £2.09k £1.51k
Total expenditure £1.29k £644 £1.53k £1.64k £1.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 September 2019 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 July 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required