Trustees WOODLEY PRESCHOOL
Charity Number: 1035042
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Harvey-Harris | Chair | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jody Margaret Irving | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Kilgannon | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Wooldridge | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Sherman | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rose Bundy | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.