LITTLE ACORNS NURSERY AT CAMELFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide childcare & education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 15 March 1994: Standard registration
- CAMELFORD PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- CAMELFORD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alanna Richards | Chair | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Graham | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Fanson | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alba Norris | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Franks | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Duvall | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
AINE MAHMUT | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Curtis | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Baker | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Jerram-smith | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Ryder-Garrett | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.35k | £79.88k | £79.35k | £70.00k | £105.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.15k | £84.44k | £81.59k | £58.00k | £91.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £200 | £200 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2022 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2022 | 249 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 379 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/03/1992 AS AMENDED ON 23/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 27/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rear of Camelford Hall
Clease Road
Camelford
Camelford
Cornwall
PL32 9PL
- Phone:
- 01840212114
- Website:
-
littleacornscamelford.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window