DUNMOW DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Daycentre provides a warm space, social interaction & freshly cooked lunches at moderate prices between 10am & 2pm every Tuesday and Thursday, for the local residents over 55. This is funded by rental of the premises to a variety of organisations for their activities with particular emphasis on groups supporting the over 55's eg Blind & Housebound & Alzheimer's groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 16 March 1994: Standard registration
- ROWENA DAVEY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN EDWARD BRADLEY FRICS | Chair | 27 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Patrick Lavelle | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lesley Bishop | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.88k | £1.14k | £22.38k | £23.85k | £35.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.51k | £8.17k | £11.46k | £17.39k | £33.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 29 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF DUNMOW. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DUNMOW WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DUNMOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dunmow Day Centre
Chequers Lane
DUNMOW
CM6 1EQ
- Phone:
- 07713710476
- Email:
- dunmowdc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window