Governing document CHORLEY AND SOUTH RIBBLE SHOPMOBILITY
Charity number: 1035095

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 AUGUST 1993, AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 1993 AND 18 JUNE 1997, 24 JUNE 1998 AND 23 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE DISABLED PERSONS IN CHORLEY AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN PARTICULAR SELF PROPELLED WHEELCHAIRS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CHORLEY AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.