BUSY BEES PLAYGROUP BLAENAVON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting local families in an area of socio-economic depression
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 16 March 1994: Standard registration
- 29 March 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 March 2010: Funds transferred to 1126728 BUSY BEES BLAENAVON DAY NURSERY AND KIDS CLUB
- BUSY BEES TODDLER PRESCHOOL AND AFTER SCHOOL GROUP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.21k | £50.44k | £101.79k | £165.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.57k | £53.50k | £96.09k | £115.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 23 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 23 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 23 April 2009 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 23 April 2009 | 297 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 28 April 2009 | 668 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1989 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window