BLUE COAT CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1035128
Charity reporting is up to date (247 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Engaging in fundraising activities to provide facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of its pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £25,952
Total expenditure: £16,182

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BLUE COAT SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Howland Chair 09 October 2023
None on record
Leila Grey Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
Louise Dolling Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
SALLY WOOTTEN Trustee 06 September 2021
None on record
Glyn Aelfryn Jones Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.68k £17.82k £13.29k £14.87k £25.95k
Total expenditure £5.51k £15.64k £14.95k £15.16k £16.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 March 2025 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 March 2025 247 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 September 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 October 2020 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Blue Coat CE Primary School
Symn Lane
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 7BD
Phone:
01453 525020
Website:

No information available