THE FRANK MISSELBROOK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1035161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Frank Misselbrook Foundation is a grant making charity with it's income derived solely from funds invested. Grants for general use and for the benefit of individuals are made to charities and organisations which have a material effect within Hampshire, particularly those concerned with education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £38,551
Total expenditure: £53,408

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jean-Marc Fabrice Legris Trustee 01 November 2023
ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHAMPTON MAGNA CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
Nigel James Lapage Trustee 12 November 2015
THE BIG DIFFERENCE
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHAMPTON MAGNA CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
PETER'S TRUST
Received: On time
THE RICHARD KIRKMAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE EMILIENNE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MISSELBROOK TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £49.43k £41.66k £53.14k £50.36k £38.55k
Total expenditure £46.91k £65.79k £33.74k £48.86k £53.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 03 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Oxford Mews
Latimer Street
Southampton
SO14 3EE
Phone:
02380274555
Website:

No information available