HOUGH AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WALKING,DARTS,BOWLING,LUNCH CLUB, BOOK CLUB, CRAFT GROUP, QUIZ GROUP . SEVERAL MEMBERS VOLUNTEER IN THE LOCAL SCHOOL AND KNIT FOR THE LOCAL HOSPITAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 21 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Hatton | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Evans | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juliana Stewart | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Mason | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Piggott | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Darlington | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Elliot | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Panayi | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA COPNALL | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL KITCHEN | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £1.09k | £3.49k | £4.78k | £4.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £630 | £3.34k | £3.77k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SILVERDALE CLOSE
WESTON
CREWE
CW2 5GW
- Phone:
- 01270821354
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window