Financial history ST MICHAEL MISSION TRUST

Charity Number: 1035199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.62k £4.62k £14.34k £16.15k £6.41k
Total expenditure £11.51k £21.23k £18.45k £18.12k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A