LIGHTWATER VILLAGE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We plan and arrange a variety of fundraising activities for both school children and parents and the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 March 1994: Standard registration
- L V S P A (Working name)
- LIGHTWATER COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Davies | Chair | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Havord | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hanson | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hazel Cole | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.01k | £8.29k | £14.15k | £4.55k | £7.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.45k | £2.96k | £8.51k | £3.79k | £6.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LIGHTWATER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lightwater Village School
Catena Rise
Lightwater
GU18 5RD
- Phone:
- 01276 473346
- Email:
- treasurer.lvspta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window