Accounts and annual returns MELIN Y WIG WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1035267
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 16 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 06 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 01 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 08 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required