Accounts and annual returns TANSOR PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1035283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window