TANSOR PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tansor Playgroup provides pre-school education for children aged from two years old to school age, for five mornings and five afternoons per week, during term times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cambridgeshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Katherine Ticehurst | Chair | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dean Thomas | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Pinion | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bierton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Troughton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Rose Morgan | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Ann Baragwanath | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Whitmee | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophia May Williams | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Sue Ross | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MEASURES | Trustee | 21 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.71k | £61.74k | £60.21k | £89.09k | £92.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.21k | £54.40k | £62.77k | £83.45k | £82.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 04 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tansor Village Hall
Main Street
Tansor
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5HS
- Phone:
- 07908378862
- Email:
- tansorplaygroup@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window