THRESHFIELD AND LINTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All the activities associated with the WI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 March 1994: Standard registration
- 20 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- THRESHFIELD & LINTON WOMENS INSTITUTE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £2.71k | £2.08k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.89k | £2.66k | £2.63k | £3.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 29 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 05 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 06 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 20 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window